Docket for 20-1608 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
May 14 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 17, 2021) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 25 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 17, 2021 to July 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jun 04 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 19, 2021. | | | Jul 19 2021 | Brief of respondent Norfolk Best in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jul 19 2021 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Norfolk Best. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Aug 04 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021. | | | Oct 04 2021 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. | | | Oct 04 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|