SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-1513
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-1513
Title:
Raj K. Patel, Petitioner
v.
Trump Corporation, et al.
Docketed:
April 28, 2021
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Case Numbers:
(20-1706)
Decision Date:
October 9, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Oct 13 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 28, 2021)
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
May 14 2021
Waiver of right of respondent Trump Corporation, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 25 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/10/2021.
Jun 14 2021
Petition DENIED.
Jun 15 2021
Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jun 25 2021
Request for recusal received from petitioner.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jul 08 2021
DISTRIBUTED.
Aug 02 2021
Rehearing DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Raj K. Patel
1239 Spring Lake Drive
Brownsburg, IN 46112
raj@rajpatel.live
317-450-6651
Party name: Raj K. Patel
Attorneys for Respondents
Joanna C. Hendon
Alston - Bird, LLP
90 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10029
Joanna.Hendon@alston.com
212-210-1244
Party name: Trump Corporation, et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##