Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1503
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1503
Title:Robert C. Laity, Petitioner
v.
Kamala D. Harris
Docketed:April 28, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-7109)
   Decision Date:February 5, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:March 18, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 16 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 28, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountAppendixProof of Service
May 07 2021Waiver of right of respondent Harris, Kamala to respond filed.
Main Document
May 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021.
May 28 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 01 2021Petition DENIED.
Jun 16 2021Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2021DISTRIBUTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert C. Laity43 Mosher Drive
Tonawanda, NY 14150-5217

(716) 260-1392
Party name: Robert Laity
Attorneys for Respondent
Beth Susan Brinkmann
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

bbrinkmann@cov.com
202-662-5312
Party name: Harris, Kamala
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543