Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1453
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1453
Title:Cal Cartage Transportation Express, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
California, et al.
Docketed:April 16, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B304240)
   Decision Date:November 19, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:February 24, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 13 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 17, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 23 2021Waiver of right of respondent California, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021.
May 03 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Cal Cartage Transportation Express, LLC, et al.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
May 04 2021Response Requested. (Due June 3, 2021)
May 04 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, California, et al.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
May 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 3, 2021 to July 6, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 11 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 6, 2021.
May 25 2021Supplemental brief of petitioners Cal Cartage Transportation Express, LLC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Motor Freight Traffic Association, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Minnesota Trucking Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service
Jun 03 2021Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation and Allied Educational Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 03 2021Brief amici curiae of American Trucking Associations, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2021Brief amicus curiae of Western States Trucking Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 04 2021Amicus brief of Western States Trucking Association not accepted for filing. (Dupilicate submission) (June 11, 2021)
Jul 02 2021Brief of respondents California, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Reply of petitioners Cal Cartage Transportation Express, LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Joshua Seth Lipshutz
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

jlipshutz@gibsondunn.com
2029558217
Party name: Cal Cartage Transportation Express, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Christopher Scott Munsey
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney
200 North Main Street, 6th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90012

chris.munsey@lacity.org
(213) 978-1846
Party name: California, et al.
Other
Kay Nord Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Lommen Abdo, P.A.
1000 International Centre
920 Second Avenue South
Minneapolis, MN 55402

kay@lommen.com
612-339-8131
Party name: The Minnesota Trucking Association
John R Bagileo
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of John R. Bagileo
15292 Calloway Court
Glenwood, MD 21738

jmbagidell@msn.com
301-404-8382
Party name: National Motor Freight Traffic Association, Inc.
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation and Allied Educational Foundation
Richard Pianka
    Counsel of Record
ATA Litigation Center
950 North Glebe Road, Suite 210
Suite 210
Arlington, VA 22203

rpianka@trucking.org
703 838-1889
Party name: American Trucking Associations, Inc., California Trucking Association, and National Private Truck Council
Patrick James Whalen
    Counsel of Record
Ellison, Whalen & Blackburn
1201 K Street, Ste. 1960
Sacramento, CA 95814

attorneys@ellisonlawoffices.com
9164482187
Party name: Western States Trucking Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543