Docket for 20-1389 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Mar 29 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 5, 2021) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 27 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 5, 2021 to June 4, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 28 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 4, 2021. | | | May 18 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 4, 2021 to July 6, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 19 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 6, 2021. | | | Jun 25 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 6, 2021 to August 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jun 28 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 5, 2021. | | | Jul 29 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 5, 2021 to September 7, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jul 30 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 7, 2021. | | | Sep 02 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 7, 2021 to October 7, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 03 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 7, 2021. | | | Oct 07 2021 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Oct 26 2021 | Reply of petitioner Kaboni Savage filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Oct 27 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/12/2021. | | | Nov 15 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|