Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1388
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1388
Title:Alice Perkins, et vir, Petitioners
v.
Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Docketed:April 6, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2481)
   Decision Date:August 12, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 16, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 31 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 6, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 09 2021Waiver of right of respondent Commissioner of Internal Revenue to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/30/2021.
Apr 21 2021Response Requested. (Due May 21, 2021)
May 07 2021Amicus brief of William A. Starna, Ph.D. not accepted for filing. (May 07, 2021--corrected version to be submitted)
May 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of William A. Starna, Ph.D. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 21, 2021 to June 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 21, 2021.
Jun 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 21, 2021 to July 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 21, 2021.
Jul 12 2021Motion to substitute Mark A. Perkins, Authorized Representative as petitioner in place of Alice Perkins, Deceased filed by petitioners.
Main Document
Jul 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 21, 2021 to August 20, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 20, 2021.
Aug 20 2021Brief of respondent Commissioner of Internal Revenue in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Sep 09 2021Reply of petitioners Alice Perkins, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Margaret A. Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Margaret A. Murphy
5354 Briercliff Drive
Hamburg, NY 14075

mam@mamurphypc.com
7168671536
Party name: Alice Perkins, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Other
Joseph John Heath
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Joseph J. Heath, Esq.
512 Jamesville Avenue
Syracuse, NY 13210

jjheath1946@gmail.com
13154474851
Party name: William A. Starna, Ph.D.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543