Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1285
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1285
Title:Immunex Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, et al.
Docketed:March 16, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1749, 2019-1777)
   Decision Date:October 13, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 11 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 15, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 15, 2021 to May 17, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 17, 2021, for all respondents.
May 17 2021Brief of Federal Respondent in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 17 2021Brief of respondents Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 21 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eldora Lynn Ellison
    Counsel of Record
Sterne, Kessler, Goldstein & Fox PLLC
1100 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20005

eellison@sternekessler.com
202-772-8508
Party name: Immunex Corporation
Attorneys for Respondents
George William Hicks Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

george.hicks@kirkland.com
2028795000
Party name: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, et al.
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543