Docket for 20-1255
|
Mar 08 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 9, 2021) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 12 2021 | Waiver of right of respondents Investment Committee of the Phillips 66 Savings Plan, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Mar 16 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021. | | | Mar 22 2021 | Response Requested. (Due April 21, 2021) | | | Apr 05 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 21, 2021 to May 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 06 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 21, 2021, for all respondents. | | | May 12 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 21, 2021 to June 10, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 13 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 10, 2021, for all respondents. | | | Jun 10 2021 | Brief of respondents Investment Committee of the Phillips 66 Savings Plan, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 30 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021. | | | Jul 13 2021 | Rescheduled. | | | Nov 23 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021. | | | Dec 13 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|