SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-1171 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-1171 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Michael Madison, Petitioner
v.
Ohio
Docketed:
February 25, 2021
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Ohio
Case Numbers:
(2016-1006)
Decision Date:
July 21, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
September 29, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 22 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 29, 2021)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 29 2021
Brief of respondent State of Ohio in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 12 2021
Reply of petitioner Michael Madison filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 14 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/30/2021.
May 03 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Timothy Farrell Sweeney
Counsel of Record
820 West Superior Avenue
Suite 430
Cleveland, OH 44113
tim@timsweeneylaw.com
216-241-5003
Party name: Michael Madison
Attorneys for Respondent
Katherine Elizabeth Mullin
Counsel of Record
Office of the Cuyahoga County Prosecutor
1200 Ontario Street, 8th Floor
Cleveland, OH 44113
kemullin@prosecutor.cuyahogacounty.us
(216) 698-6454
Party name: State of Ohio
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##