Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1130
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1130
Title:Ericsson Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
TCL Communication Technology Holdings Limited, et al.
Docketed:February 17, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-2003)
   Decision Date:April 14, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:September 15, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 11 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 19, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 17 2021Brief of respondents TCL Communication Technology Holdings, Limited, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2021Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from March 31, 2021 to April 7, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 29 2021Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until April 7, 2021 granted.
Apr 06 2021Reply of petitioners Ericsson Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 07 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021.
Apr 26 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/30/2021.
May 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021.
May 17 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 500
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
(202) 556-2010
Party name: Ericsson Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Lionel M. Lavenue
    Counsel of Record
Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP
Two Freedom Square
Reston, VA 20190

lionel.lavenue@finnegan.com
571 203 2750
Party name: TCL Communication Technology Holdings, Limited, et al.
David Kenneth MrozFinnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner
901 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

david.mroz@finnegan.com
7243961316
Party name: TCL Communication Technology Holdings, Limited, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543