Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1126
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1126
Title:Joachim Carlo Santos Martillo, et al., Petitioners
v.
Unknown Defendants
Docketed:February 17, 2021
Lower Ct:Appeals Court of Massachusetts
   Case Numbers:(19-P-748)
   Decision Date:May 26, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 19, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:August 28, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 25 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 19, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Apr 19 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Joachim Carlo Santos Martillo75 Bailey St.
Ste. 1L
Boston, MA 02124

Party name: Joachim Martillo

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543