SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-1125 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-1125 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Antonio Devoe Jones, Petitioner
v.
Alabama
Docketed:
February 17, 2021
Lower Ct:
Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama
Case Numbers:
(CR-13-1552)
Decision Date:
November 22, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
May 15, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
September 11, 2020
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 08 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 19, 2021)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 22 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 19, 2021 to April 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 23 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 19, 2021.
Apr 16 2021
Brief of respondent Alabama in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 30 2021
Reply of petitioner Antonio Jones filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
May 04 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/20/2021.
May 24 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Steven Alan Miller
Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
10 S. Wacker Drive
Suite 4000
Chicago, IL 60606
SAMiller@reedsmith.com
3122073857
Party name: Antonio Jones
Attorneys for Respondent
Audrey Jordan
Counsel of Record
Alabama Attorney General
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36130
audrey.jordan@alabamaag.gov
334-353-4338
Party name: Alabama
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##