Docket for 19M132 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Apr 02 2020 | Motion to direct the Clerk to file a petition for a writ of certiorari out of time filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceOtherOtherOther | Apr 08 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/24/2020. | | | Apr 27 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/1/2020. | | | May 04 2020 | Motion considered closed. | | |
|