SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19A513 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19A513 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Willie B. Smith, III, Applicant
v.
Jefferson S. Dunn, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections
Docketed:
November 7, 2019
Linked with 19-7745
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Case Numbers:
(17-15043)
Decision Date:
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 07 2019
Application (19A513) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 22, 2019 to February 20, 2020, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Nov 12 2019
Application (19A513) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 20, 2020.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Steven Joseph Horowitz
Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
One South Dearborn Street
Chicago, IL 60603
shorowitz@sidley.com
(312) 853-7143
Party name: Willie B. Smith, III
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##