Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19A191
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19A191
Title:Cedric L. McDonald, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:August 19, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(18-0308/AR)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 06 2019Application (19A191) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 27, 2019 to October 26, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 19 2019Application (19A191) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 26, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Zachary Allen Gray
    Counsel of Record
U.S. Army JAG Corps, U.S. Army Legal Services Agency
9275 Gunston Road
Fort Belvoir, VA 22060

zachary.a.gray8.mil@mail.mil
7036930648
Party name: Cedric L. McDonald
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543