Docket for 19A1035
|
May 07 2020 | Application (19A1035) for a stay pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Proof of ServiceMain DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions | May 08 2020 | UPON CONSIDERATION of the application of counsel for the applicant,
IT IS ORDERED that the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit, case No. 19-5288, is hereby stayed pending receipt of a response, due on or before Monday, May 18, 2020, by 3 p.m. ET, and further order of The Chief Justice or of the Court. | | | May 18 2020 | Response to application from respondent House Committee on the Judiciary filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 19 2020 | Reply of applicant Department of Justice filed. | | Proof of ServiceReply | May 20 2020 | Application (19A1035) granted. The application for stay of the mandate presented to The Chief Justice and by him referred to the Court is granted. The issuance of the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit, case No. 19-5288, is stayed pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, if such petition is filed on or before June 1, 2020, by 5 p.m. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the issuance of the judgment of this Court. If no petition for a writ of certiorari is filed on or before June 1, 2020, by 5 p.m., the stay shall terminate. | | |
|