Docket for 19-992
|
Dec 18 2019 | Application (19A689) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 6, 2020 to February 5, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions | Dec 18 2019 | Application (19A689) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until February 5, 2020. | | | Feb 05 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 9, 2020) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 17 2020 | Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Curtis Jerome Byrd. | | Blanket Consent | Feb 20 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 9, 2020 to April 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 25 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 8, 2020. | | | Mar 05 2020 | Brief amici curiae of States of Ohio, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 07 2020 | Brief of respondent Curtis Jerome Byrd in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentOtherOther | Apr 07 2020 | Brief of Curtis Jerome Byrd in opposition not accepted for filing. (April 28, 2020)(Duplicate submission) | | | Apr 17 2020 | Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from April 22, 2020 to May 5, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 20 2020 | Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until May 5, 2020, granted. | | | Apr 30 2020 | Reply of petitioner Greg Skipper, Warden filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 05 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/21/2020. | | | May 26 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|