Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-968
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-968
Title:Chike Uzuegbunam, et al., Petitioners
v.
Stanley C. Preczewski, et al.
Docketed:February 3, 2020
Linked with 19A461
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-12676)
   Decision Date:July 1, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 4, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 24 2019Application (19A461) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 3, 2019 to January 31, 2020, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Oct 28 2019Application (19A461) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 31, 2020.
Jan 31 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 4, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 13 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Chike Uzuegbunam, et al.
Blanket Consent
Feb 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 4, 2020 to April 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 19 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Stanley Preczewski, et al.
Blanket Consent
Feb 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 8, 2020.
Feb 28 2020Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Young Americans for Liberty, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Humanist Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Islam and Religious Freedom Action Team of the Religious Freedom Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights in Education filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of CatholicVote.org Education Fund filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 27 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 8, 2020 to April 22, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 22, 2020.
Apr 22 2020Brief of respondents Stanley Preczewski, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/21/2020.
May 05 2020Reply of petitioners Chike Uzuegbunam, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/8/2020.
Jul 09 2020Petition GRANTED.
Jul 27 2020Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 28 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Chike Uzuegbunam, et al.
Blanket Consent
Aug 03 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Stanley Preczewski, et al.
Blanket Consent
Aug 06 2020Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 8, 2020. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 22, 2020.
Aug 25 2020Joint motion for a further extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Sep 01 2020Joint motion to further extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 22, 2020. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is further extended to and including November 19, 2020.
Sep 22 2020Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 22 2020Brief of petitioners Chike Uzuegbunam, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2020Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Sep 24 2020Brief amicus curiae of Council on American-Islamic Relations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2020Brief amicus curiae of Young Americans for Liberty, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2020Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 28 2020Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of Child Evangelism Fellowship, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of Frederick Douglass Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2020Brief amici curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights in Education and Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2020Brief amici curiae of General Conference of Seventh-day Adventists, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2020Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Islam and Religious Freedom Action Team of the Religious Freedom Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2020Brief amici curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of Christian Legal Society filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of CatholicVote.org Education Fund filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2020Brief amici curiae of Justice and Freedom Fund, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2020Amicus brief of American Humanist Association not accepted for filing. (October 06, 2020) (Corrected version submitted)
Sep 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Humanist Association filed. (10/07/2020)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kristen Kellie Waggoner
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, N.W.
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

kwaggoner@adflegal.org
202-393-8690
Party name: Chike Uzuegbunam, et al.
John J. BurschAlliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Chike Uzuegbunam, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Andrew Alan Pinson
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Georgia Attorney General
40 Capital Square SW
Atlanta, GA 30334-1300

apinson@law.ga.gov
404-651-9453
Party name: Stanley Preczewski, et al.
Other
Matthew Adam Seligman
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009

mseligman@citizen.org
9174286055
Party name: Public Citizen
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, Americans for Prosperity Foundation, Americans United for Separation of Church and State, and Institute for Justice
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
1 Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

matt@morallaw.org
334-262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Road
7th Floor
Arlington, VA 22201

cynthia.crawford@causeofaction.org
2024992421
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Allen Joseph Dickerson
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Free Speech
1150 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 801
Washington, DC 20036

adickerson@ifs.org
(202) 301-9000
Party name: Institute for Free Speech
Frank Dawson Garrison IV
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

fdg@nrtw.org
703-321-8510
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
Scott William Gaylord
    Counsel of Record
Elon University School of Law Appellate Clinic
201 North Greene Street
Greensboro, NC 27401

sgaylord@elon.edu
3362799331
Party name: CatholicVote.org Education Fund
James L. Hirsen
    Counsel of Record
Suite 101
505 S. Villa Real Drive
Anaheim Hills, CA 92807

james@jameshirsen.com
714-283-8880
Party name: Justice and Freedom Fund, et al.
Daniel Patrick Kearney Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20006

Daniel.Kearney@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty
Adele Auxier Keim
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Ave N.W.
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

akeim@becketlaw.org
202-955-0095
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts LLP
700 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

scott.keller@bakerbotts.com
2026397837
Party name: Young Americans for Liberty, Inc.
Kevin Franz King
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

kking@cov.com
2026625488
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights in Education
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLaFetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, Delaney Wysingle, Rentberry Inc., Luis Ramirez, Michael Jackson, Tory Smith, and Jillian Ostrewich
Elbert Lin
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
951 E. Byrd Street
Riverfront Plaza, East Tower
Richmond, VA 23219-4074

elin@HuntonAK.com
804-788-7202
Party name: The Islam and Religious Freedom Action Team of the Religious Freedom Institute
Michael J. Lockerby
    Counsel of Record
Foley & Lardner LLP
Washington Harbour
3000 K Street, N.W., Suite 600
Washington, DC 20007-5109

mlockerby@foley.com
202-945-6079
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Lena Fatina Masri
    Counsel of Record
CAIR Legal Defense Fund
453 New Jersey Avenue SE
Washington, DC 20003

ldf@cair.com
2027426420
Party name: Council on American-Islamic Relations
Eric D. McArthur
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

emcarthur@sidley.com
(202) 736-8018
Party name: Frederick Douglass Foundation, Inc.
Todd R. McFarland
    Counsel of Record
General Conference of Seventh-day Adventist Church
Office of General Counsel
12501 Old Columbia Pike
Silver Spring, MD 20904-6600

mcfarlandt@gc.adventist.org
3016816321
Party name: General Conference of Seventh-day Adventists
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
202-261-3378
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al.
Monica Lynn Miller
    Counsel of Record
American Humanist Association
1821 Jefferson Place NW
Washington, DC 20036

mmiller@americanhumanist.org
2022389088
Party name: American Humanist Association
Reed Neal Smith
    Counsel of Record
Christian Legal Society Center For Law and Religious Freedom
8001 Braddock Rd
Ste 302
Springfield, VA 22151

rsmith@clsnet.org
7038941081
Party name: Christian Legal Society
Mathew D. Staver
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Counsel
PO Box 540774
Orlando, FL 32854

court@lc.org
407-875-1776
Party name: Child Evangelism Fellowship, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543