Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-902
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-902
Title:Michael Ramon Ochoa, Petitioner
v.
Arthur Levine, et al.
Docketed:January 23, 2020
Lower Ct:Superior Court of Pennsylvania, Pittsburgh Office
   Case Numbers:(326 WDA 2019)
   Decision Date:March 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:April 9, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:September 16, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 25 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 24, 2020)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 27 2020Waiver of right of respondents Chariman of the Board of Trustees Preston G. Athey, Headmaster Zachary Lehman and The Hill School to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 04 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020.
Mar 23 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Ramon Ochoa58 West Portal Avenue#218
San Francisco, CA 94127

michaelochoa@mac.com
(415) 373-2172
Party name: Michael Ochoa
Attorneys for Respondents
John J. Hare
    Counsel of Record
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman and Goggin
2000 Market Street
Philadelphia, PA 19103

jjhare@mdwcg.com
215-575-2609
Party name: Chariman of the Board of Trustees Preston G. Athey, Headmaster Zachary Lehman and The Hill School

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543