Docket for 19-8903 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jun 30 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 5, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetition | Jul 29 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 5, 2020 to September 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jul 30 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 4, 2020. | | | Sep 04 2020 | Brief of respondent Indiana in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 24 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020. | | | Oct 13 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|