SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-8845 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-8845 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Charles Grover Brant, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:
June 29, 2020
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC18-1061)
Decision Date:
November 7, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Apr 07 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 29, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Appendix
Proof of Service
Jul 14 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 29, 2020 to August 28, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 16 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 28, 2020.
Aug 26 2020
Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Sep 10 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Marie-Louise Samuels Parmer
Counsel of Record
Parmer DeLiberato, P.A.
P.O. Box 18988
Tampa, FL 33679
marie@parmerdeliberato.com
813-732-3321
Party name: Charles Grover Brant
Attorneys for Respondent
Amitabh Agarwal
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
The Capitol PL-01
Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050
amit.agarwal@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3688
Party name: Florida
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##