SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-8831 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-8831 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Eric Reid, Petitioner
v.
Arkansas
Docketed:
June 26, 2020
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Arkansas
Case Numbers:
(18-517)
Decision Date:
December 5, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
January 23, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jun 22 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 27, 2020)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Jul 13 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 27, 2020 to September 10, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jul 14 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 10, 2020.
Sep 10 2020
Brief of respondent Arkansas in opposition filed.
Main Document
Other
Proof of Service
Sep 24 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 13 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Willard Proctor Jr.
Counsel of Record
2500 South State Street
Little Rock, AR 72206-2162
willard@wpjrlaw.com
(501) 378-7720
Party name: Eric Reid
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael Anthony Cantrell
Counsel of Record
Office of the Arkansas Attorney General
323 Center Street, Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201
michael.cantrell@arkansasag.gov
501-682-2401
Party name: Arkansas
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##