SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-8742 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-8742 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Harold Wayne Nichols, Petitioner
v.
Tennessee
Docketed:
June 18, 2020
Lower Ct:
Court of Criminal Appeals of Tennessee, Eastern Division
Case Numbers:
(E2018-00626-CCA-R3-PD)
Decision Date:
October 10, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
January 15, 2020
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jun 15 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 20, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Jul 16 2020
Brief of respondent Tennessee in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Other
Jul 30 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 05 2020
Reply of petitioner Harold Nichols filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Other
Proof of Service
Oct 05 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dana Hansen Chavis
Counsel of Record
800 South Gay Street
Suite 2400
Knoxville, TN 37929
Dana_Hansen@fd.org
865-637-7979
Party name: Harold Nichols
Attorneys for Respondent
Zachary Thomas Hinkle
Counsel of Record
Tennessee Attorney General & Reporter
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202
zachary.hinkle@ag.tn.gov
6155320986
Party name: Tennessee
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##