SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-8660 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-8660 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Thomas Michael Riley, Petitioner
v.
Arizona
Docketed:
June 10, 2020
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Arizona
Case Numbers:
(CR-15-0411-AP)
Decision Date:
March 10, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jun 01 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 10, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Jul 09 2020
Brief of respondent State of Arizona in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jul 17 2020
Reply of petitioner Thomas Riley filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jul 23 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mikel Patrick Steinfeld
Counsel of Record
Maricopa County Office of the Public Defender
620 W. Jackson, Suite 4015
Phoenix, AZ 85003
mikel.steinfeld@maricopa.gov
602-506-7711
Party name: Thomas Riley
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth Therese Bingert
Counsel of Record
Arizona Attorney Generals Office
2005 N Central Ave
Phoenix, AZ 85004
elizabeth.bingert@azag.gov
602-542-8590
Party name: State of Arizona
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##