SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-8441 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-8441 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Richard John Vieira, Petitioner
v.
California
Docketed:
May 12, 2020
Lower Ct:
Court of Appeal of California, Fifth Appellate District
Case Numbers:
(F079990)
Decision Date:
December 6, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
February 19, 2020
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Apr 17 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 11, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
May 31 2020
Supplemental brief of petitioner Richard John Vieira filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jun 04 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 11, 2020 to July 13, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 05 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 13, 2020.
Jul 02 2020
Brief of respondent California in opposition filed.
Main Document
Jul 16 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Jul 21 2020
Reply of petitioner Richard John Vieira filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Oct 05 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard John Vieira
H-31000
San Quentin Prison
San Quentin, CA 94974
Party name: Richard John Vieira
Attorneys for Respondent
Catherine Baker Chatman
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, California
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 94244-4463
catherine.chatman@doj.ca.gov
(916) 210-7699
Party name: California
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##