Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-840
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-840
Vide 19-841
Title:California, et al., Petitioners
v.
Texas, et al.
Docketed:January 3, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-10011)
   Decision Date:December 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 03 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 3, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2020Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioners.
Main Document
Jan 06 2020Response to motion requested. (Due January 10, 2020, by 4 p.m.)
Jan 10 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, U.S. House of Representatives.
Blanket Consent
Jan 10 2020Response to motion from Federal respondents filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 10 2020Response to motion from State respondents filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 10 2020Response to motion from respondent Neill Hurley and John Nantz submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Jan 13 2020Reply in support of motion filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 15 2020Brief amicus curiae of America's Health Insurance Plans filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2020Brief amici curiae of National Hospital Associations filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2020Brief amici curiae of American Cancer Society et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by 33 State Hospital Associations.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 15 2020Brief amici curiae of Bipartisan Economic Scholars filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2020Brief amicus curiae of Small Business Majority Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2020Brief amici curiae of AARP, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2020Brief amicus curiae of Bipartisan Economic Scholars filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2020Brief amici curiae of Alliance of Community Health Plans and Association for Community Affiliated Plans filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2020Brief amicus curiae of Jeremy C. Doerre filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 21 2020Motion to expedite consideration filed by petitioner DENIED.
Jan 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 3, 2020 to March 17, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 22 2020Response to motion from respondent U.S. House of Representatives filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Response to motion from petitioners California, et al. filed.
Main Document
Jan 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response to the petition for a writ of certiorari is denied.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Samuel Passchier Siegel
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

sam.siegel@doj.ca.gov
(916) 210-6269
Party name: California, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States, et al.
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: State of Texas, et al.
Robert Earl Henneke
    Counsel of Record
Texas Public Policy Foundation
901 Congress Avenue
Austin, TX 78701

rhenneke@texaspolicy.com
512-472-2700
Party name: Neill Hurley and John Nantz
Douglas Neal Letter
    Counsel of Record
219 Cannon House Office Building
Washington, DC 20515-6532

douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
202-225-9700
Party name: U.S. House of Representatives
Other
Allen Xavier Baker
    Counsel of Record
Crowell & Moring LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

xbaker@crowell.com
202-624-2842
Party name: Alliance of Community Health Plans and Association for Community Affiliated Plans
Jeremy Cooper Doerre
    Counsel of Record
Tillman Wright, PLLC
3440 Toringdon Way, Suite 310
Charlotte, NC 28277

jdoerre@ti-law.com
7042484883
Party name: Jeremy C. Doerre
Maame Gyamfi
    Counsel of Record
AARP Foundation Litigation
601 E Street NW
Washington, DC 20049

mgyamfi@aarp.org
202-434-6291
Party name: AARP, et al.
Matthew S. Hellman
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

mhellman@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Bipartisan Economic Scholars
Hyland Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave. NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

hhunt@deutschhunt.com
2028686915
Party name: Small Business Majority Foundation
John Louis Longstreth
    Counsel of Record
K&L Gates LLP
1601 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

john.longstreth@klgates.com
2022533435
Party name: American Cancer Society et al.
Sean Marotta
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

sean.marotta@hoganlovells.com
2026374881
Party name: National Hospital Associations
William Barnett Schultz
    Counsel of Record
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
1800 M Street NW, Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20036-5802

wschultz@zuckerman.com
202-778-1800
Party name: 33 State Hospital Associations
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: America's Health Insurance Plans

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543