Apr 16 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 22, 2020) |
| PetitionPetitionPetitionPetitionPetition |
May 08 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 22, 2020 to June 22, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
May 11 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 22, 2020. |
| |
Jun 17 2020 | Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Jul 02 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. |
| |
Aug 13 2020 | Record Requested. |
| |
Sep 14 2020 | Record received from the Supreme Court of California (14 boxes). |
| |
Sep 24 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020. |
| |
Sep 24 2020 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Oct 13 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020. |
| |
Oct 13 2020 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Oct 26 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/30/2020. |
| |
Nov 02 2020 | Petition DENIED. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
| |
Feb 23 2021 | Record returned to the Supreme Court of California (14 boxes). |
| |