Docket for 19-8239 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 24 2020 | Application (19A854) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 5, 2020 to April 3, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main Document | Jan 29 2020 | Application (19A854) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until April 3, 2020. | | | Mar 31 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 11, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service | May 11 2020 | Brief of respondents William Gittere, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 13 2020 | Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from May 26, 2020 to June 10, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 14 2020 | Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until June 10, 2020, granted. | | | Jun 04 2020 | Reply of petitioner Robert Ybarra, Jr. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jun 10 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020. | | | Jun 29 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|