Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-8149
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-8149
Title:Nathaniel Lambert, Petitioner
v.
Louisiana
Docketed:March 31, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of Louisiana, Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-KA-0777)
   Decision Date:March 27, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:January 22, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 16 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 30, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Apr 20 2020Waiver of right of respondent Louisiana to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 22 2020Supplemental brief of petitioner Nathaniel Lambert filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
Apr 29 2020Response Requested. (Due May 29, 2020)
May 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 29, 2020 to June 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 29, 2020.
Jun 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 29, 2020 to July 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 29, 2020.
Jul 22 2020Brief of respondent Louisiana in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 30 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from August 6, 2020 to August 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 03 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until August 20, 2020, granted.
Aug 20 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 20 2020Reply of petitioner Nathaniel Lambert filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 05 2020Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Ramos v. Louisiana, 590 U. S. ___ (2020).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amir H. Ali
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
501 H St. NE
Suite 275
Washington, DC 20002

amir.ali@macarthurjustice.org
202-869-3434
Party name: Nathaniel Lambert
Nathaniel Lambert90883
Main Prison West, Hickory-2
Louisiana State Penitentiary
Angola, LA 70712

Party name: Nathaniel Lambert
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70804-9005

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: Louisiana

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543