Docket for 19-8103 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 08 2020 | Application (19A776) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 20, 2020 to February 19, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Jan 10 2020 | Application (19A776) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 19, 2020. | | | Feb 06 2020 | Application (19A776) to extend further the time from February 19, 2020 to March 20, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Written RequestProof of Service | Feb 10 2020 | Application (19A776) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 20, 2020. | | | Mar 18 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 27, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Apr 22 2020 | Brief of respondent Lorie Davis in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 30 2020 | Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from May 6, 2020 to May 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 01 2020 | Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until May 20, 2020, granted. | | | May 15 2020 | Reply of petitioner Ramiro Ibarra filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 20 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020. | | | Jun 08 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|