Nov 06 2019 | Application (19A526) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 5, 2019 to February 3, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions |
Nov 13 2019 | Application (19A526) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 4, 2020. |
| |
Dec 17 2019 | Application (19A526) to extend further the time from January 4, 2020 to January 17, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito. |
| Written RequestProof of Service |
Dec 30 2019 | Application (19A526) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 17, 2020. |
| |
Jan 17 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 17, 2020) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Mar 20 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 17, 2020 to June 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Mar 20 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 16, 2020. |
| |
Jun 16 2020 | Brief of respondent Louisiana in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Jul 09 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. |
| |
Aug 16 2020 | Reply of petitioner Jeffrey Clark filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Oct 05 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
| |