Docket for 19-8009 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Mar 13 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 16, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 03 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 16, 2020 to May 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 06 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 18, 2020. See Rule 30.1. | | | Apr 13 2020 | Brief amicus curiae of Embassy of Pakistan, Iranian Interests Section filed. | | Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceProof of Service | May 05 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 18, 2020 to June 17, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 06 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 17, 2020. | | | Jun 17 2020 | Brief of respondent Broomfield, Warden in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 30 2020 | Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from July 2, 2020 to July 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jun 30 2020 | Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until July 16, 2020, granted. | | | Jul 13 2020 | Brief of Hooman Ashkan Panah in support not accepted for filing. (July 13, 2020) | | | Jul 13 2020 | Reply of petitioner Hooman Ashkan Panah filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 16 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. | | | Oct 05 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|