SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-7856 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-7856 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Richard Kenneth Djerf, Petitioner
v.
David Shinn, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections
Docketed:
March 3, 2020
Linked with 19A688
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(08-99027)
Decision Date:
July 24, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
October 2, 2019
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 17 2019
Application (19A688) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 31, 2019 to February 28, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Dec 19 2019
Application (19A688) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 28, 2020.
Feb 28 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 2, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Mar 31 2020
Brief of respondents David Shinn, et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Other
Apr 14 2020
Reply of petitioner Richard Djerf filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 16 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/1/2020.
May 04 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Therese Michelle Day
Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender of Arizona
850 West Adams Street, Suite 201
Phoenix, AZ 85007
therese_day@fd.org
602-382-7332
Party name: Richard Djerf
Attorneys for Respondent
Ginger Jarvis
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Arizona
2005 N. Central Ave.
Phoenix, AZ 85004
ginger.jarvis@azag.gov
(602) 542-8557
Party name: David Shinn, et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##