SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-7699 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-7699 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Anthony Carr, Petitioner
v.
Mississippi
Docketed:
February 19, 2020
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Mississippi
Case Numbers:
(2017-CA-01481-SCT)
Decision Date:
June 6, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
September 12, 2019
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 11 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 20, 2020)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Proof of Service
Mar 18 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 20, 2020 to April 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 19 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 20, 2020.
Apr 16 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 20, 2020 to May 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 17 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 20, 2020.
May 20 2020
Brief of respondent State of Mississippi in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jun 03 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/18/2020.
Jun 03 2020
Reply of petitioner Anthony Carr filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jun 22 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alexander Dunlap Moorhead Kassoff
Counsel of Record
Mississippi Office of Capital Post-Conviction Counsel
239 N. Lamar Street, Suite 404
Jackson, MS 39201
akassoff@pcc.state.ms.us
6013595733
Party name: Anthony Carr
Attorneys for Respondent
LaDonna Curtis Holland
Counsel of Record
Mississippi Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 220
Jackson, MS 39205
lholl@ago.state.ms.us
6013593827
Party name: State of Mississippi
Jason Lewis Davis
Mississippi Attorney General
550 High Street
Suite 1300
Jackson, MS 39201
jdavi@ago.state.ms.us
6013593820
Party name: State of Mississippi
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##