Docket for 19-7670 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Feb 11 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 16, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 26 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 16, 2020 to April 15, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 28 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 15, 2020. | | | Mar 25 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 15, 2020 to May 15, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 26 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 15, 2020. | | | Apr 16 2020 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief Out of Time filed by Embassy of Pakistan, Iranian Interests Section. | | Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 12 2020 | Brief of respondent Ron Broomfield in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 26 2020 | Reply of petitioner Hooman Panah filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 27 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/11/2020. | | | Jun 15 2020 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Embassy of Pakistan, Iranian Interests Section DENIED. | | | Jun 15 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|