Docket for 19-7627 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 25 2019 | Application (19A602) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 9, 2019 to February 7, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Nov 27 2019 | Application (19A602) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 7, 2020. | | | Feb 07 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 12, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Mar 03 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 12, 2020 to April 13, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 05 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 13, 2020. | | | Apr 13 2020 | Brief of respondents David Shinn, et al. in opposition filed. | | Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document | Apr 27 2020 | Reply of petitioner Ernesto Martinez filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 29 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020. | | | May 18 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|