Docket for 19-7481 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 27 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 28, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Feb 26 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 28, 2020 to March 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 03 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 30, 2020. | | | Mar 26 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 30, 2020 to April 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 30 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 29, 2020. | | | Apr 29 2020 | Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 13 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/28/2020. | | | Jun 01 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|