Docket for 19-7456 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Dec 06 2019 | Application (19A665) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 19, 2019 to January 23, 2020, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Dec 17 2019 | Application (19A665) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 23, 2020. | | | Jan 23 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 27, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Feb 13 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 27, 2020 to March 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 18 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 30, 2020. | | | Mar 23 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 30, 2020 to April 13, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 24 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 13, 2020. | | | Apr 22 2020 | Brief of respondent State of Alabama in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 30 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 13, 2020 to April 22, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 01 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 22, 2020. | | | May 06 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/21/2020. | | | May 26 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|