SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-7429 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-7429 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Louis Mitchell, Jr., Petitioner
v.
California
Docketed:
January 28, 2020
Linked with 19A561
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of California
Case Numbers:
(S147335)
Decision Date:
June 24, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
August 28, 2019
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 14 2019
Application (19A561) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 26, 2019 to January 25, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Nov 19 2019
Application (19A561) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 25, 2020.
Jan 23 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 27, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Proof of Service
Feb 20 2020
Brief of respondent The State of California in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Mar 04 2020
Reply of petitioner Louis Mitchell, Jr. filed. (Distributed).
Main Document
Proof of Service
Mar 05 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020.
Mar 23 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Maria Jesus Morga
Counsel of Record
California Office of the State Public Defender
1111 Broadway, Suite 1000
Oakland, CA 94607
maria.morga@ospd.ca.gov
510-267-3300
Party name: Louis Mitchell, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Kristen Kinnaird Chenelia
Counsel of Record
CA Dept. of Justice, Office of the Attorney General
600 West Broadway, Suite 1800
San Diego, CA 92101
kristen.chenelia@doj.ca.gov
619 7389007
Party name: The State of California
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##