SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-7393 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-7393 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
In Re David Gulbrandson, Petitioner
Docketed:
January 23, 2020
Lower Ct:
Case Numbers:
Decision Date:
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 17 2020
Petition for writ of habeas corpus and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed.
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Feb 18 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 24, 2020 to March 25, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Feb 20 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 25, 2020.
Mar 25 2020
Brief of respondent State of Arizona in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 09 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/24/2020.
Apr 27 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Timothy M. Gabrielsen
Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
407 W. Congress, Ste. 501
Suite 501
Tucson, AZ 85701
tim_gabrielsen@fd.org
520-879-7614
Party name: In Re David Gulbrandson
Attorneys for Respondent
Lacey Stover Gard
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
400 West Congress Street
Bldg. S-315
Tucson, AZ 85701
lacey.gard@azag.gov
5206286654
Party name: State of Arizona
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##