Docket for 19-7222 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Oct 18 2019 | Application (19A460) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 7, 2019 to January 6, 2020, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document | Oct 29 2019 | Application (19A460) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 6, 2020. | | | Jan 06 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 10, 2020) | | PetitionPetitionPetitionPetition | Feb 10 2020 | Brief of respondent Edward Thomas in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Feb 14 2020 | Reply of petitioner Timothy Richardson filed. | | Main DocumentMain Document | Feb 27 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020. | | | Mar 23 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|