Docket for 19-6927 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Dec 10 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 13, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionPetitionProof of Service | Jan 06 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 13, 2020 to February 12, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 08 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 12, 2020. | | | Feb 07 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 12, 2020 to March 13, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 10 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 13, 2020. | | | Mar 13 2020 | Brief of respondent State of Texas in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 26 2020 | Reply of petitioner Tony Egbuna Ford filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 02 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020. | | | Apr 20 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|