Docket for 19-6918 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Sep 20 2019 | Application (19A339) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 9, 2019 to December 8, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions | Sep 25 2019 | Application (19A339) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 8, 2019. | | | Dec 09 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 13, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of ServicePetitionAppendixProof of Service | Dec 20 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 13, 2020 to February 12, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 27 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 12, 2020. | | | Feb 12 2020 | Brief of Benjamin Ford in opposition not accepted for filing. (February 19, 2020) (Duplicate Submission). | | | Feb 12 2020 | Brief of respondent Benjamin Ford in opposition filed. (2/19/2020). | | Main DocumentOther | Feb 26 2020 | Reply of petitioner Michael Wade Nance filed. (Distributed) | | Main Document | Feb 27 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020. | | | Mar 23 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|