Docket for 19-6684
|
Nov 12 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 19, 2019) | | PetitionMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of ServiceOther | Dec 19 2019 | Memorandum of respondent United States filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | Jan 09 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020. | | | Jan 27 2020 | Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Rehaif v. United States, 588 U. S. ___ (2019). | | | Feb 28 2020 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. | | |
|