Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-66
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-66
Title:George Q. Ricks, Petitioner
v.
Idaho Contractors Board, et al.
Docketed:July 12, 2019
Linked with 18A1256
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Idaho
   Case Numbers:(45396)
   Decision Date:December 3, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 12, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
May 31 2019Application (18A1256) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 10, 2019 to July 10, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 03 2019Application (18A1256) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 10, 2019.
Jul 10 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 12, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Brief amici curiae of General Conference of Seventh-Day Adventists, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Brief amici curiae of Ten Legal Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 12 2019Brief amici curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty and Asma T. Uddin filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Aug 12 2019Waiver of right of respondent Idaho Contractors Board to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 15 2019Proof of service filed with respect to brief amici curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty and Asma T. Uddin.
Main Document
Aug 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 06 2019Response Requested. (Due October 7, 2019)
Sep 24 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 7, 2019 to November 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 27 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 6, 2019.
Oct 07 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 06 2019Brief of respondents Idaho Contractors Board, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 19 2019Reply of petitioner George Ricks filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 19 2019Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition under to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Nov 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019.
Dec 03 2019Rescheduled.
Dec 09 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019.
Dec 11 2019Rescheduled.
Jan 06 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 21 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric S. Baxter
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Ave NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

ebaxter@becketlaw.org
2029550095
Party name: George Ricks
Attorneys for Respondents
Leslie Marie Goemaere Hayes
    Counsel of Record
Idaho Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 83720
Boise, ID 83720-0010

leslie.hayes@ag.idaho.gov
(208) 334-4538
Party name: Idaho Contractors Board
Other
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
202-261-3378
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
Howard Nathan Slugh
    Counsel of Record
2400 VIRGINIA AVE NW
APT C619
WASHINGTON, DC 20037-2622

hslugh@jcrl.org
9543289461
Party name: Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty and Asma T. Uddin
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Thomas G. Hungar
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

thungar@gibsondunn.com
2029558500
Party name: Ten Legal Scholars
Daniel Patrick Kearney Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20006

Daniel.Kearney@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: General Conference of Seventh-Day Adventists, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543