SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-6567 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-6567 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Danny Lee Hill, Petitioner
v.
Ohio
Docketed:
November 8, 2019
Linked with 19A242
Lower Ct:
Court of Appeals of Ohio, Trumbull County
Case Numbers:
(2016-T-0099)
Decision Date:
December 3, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
June 12, 2019
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Aug 28 2019
Application (19A242) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 10, 2019 to November 9, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Aug 30 2019
Application (19A242) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until November 12, 2019.
Nov 06 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 9, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Dec 03 2019
Brief of respondent State of Ohio in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Dec 19 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 23 2019
Reply of petitioner Danny Hill filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Other
Proof of Service
Jan 13 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Vicki Ruth Adams Werneke
Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office Northern Distrist of Ohio
1660 West Second Street
Suite 750
Cleveland, OR 44113
vicki_werneke@fd.org
216-861-3926
Party name: Danny Hill
Attorneys for Respondent
Dennis Watkins
Counsel of Record
Trumbull County Prosecutor's Office
160 High Street NW
Fourth Floor
Warren, OH 44481
prosecutor@co.trumbull.oh.us
3306752426
Party name: State of Ohio
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##