Docket for 19-6482 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Oct 31 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 4, 2019) | | PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service | Nov 26 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 4, 2019 to January 3, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 29 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 3, 2020. | | | Dec 20 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 3, 2020 to February 2, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 27 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 3, 2020. | | | Feb 03 2020 | Brief of respondent Lorie Davis in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Feb 17 2020 | Reply of petitioner Demetrius Smith filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Feb 20 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020. | | | Mar 09 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|