Nov 15 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 16, 2019) |
| PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Dec 12 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 16, 2019 to January 15, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Dec 13 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 15, 2020. |
| |
Jan 08 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 15, 2020 to January 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jan 09 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 29, 2020. |
| |
Jan 29 2020 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Feb 12 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020. |
| |
Feb 12 2020 | Reply of petitioner Edwin Arthur Avery filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Mar 02 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020. |
| |
Mar 16 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020. |
| |
Mar 23 2020 | Petition DENIED. Statement of Justice Kavanaugh respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion) |
| |