SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-6101 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-6101 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Raymond Eugene Johnson, Petitioner
v.
Tommy Sharp, Interim Warden
Docketed:
September 30, 2019
Linked with 19A66
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(16-5165)
Decision Date:
March 19, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
April 29, 2019
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jul 12 2019
Application (19A66) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 28, 2019 to September 26, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Jul 16 2019
Application (19A66) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until September 26, 2019.
Sep 26 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 30, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Oct 24 2019
Brief of respondent Tommy Sharp in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Nov 06 2019
Reply of petitioner Raymond Eugene Johnson filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Nov 07 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/22/2019.
Nov 25 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas David Hird
Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
215 Dean A. McGee, Suite 707
Oklahoma City, OK 73102
Tom_Hird@fd.org
405-609-5975
Party name: Raymond Eugene Johnson
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer L. Crabb
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
313 N.E. 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105
fhc.docket@oag.ok.gov
405-521-3921
Party name: Tommy Sharp
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##