SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-5927 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-5927 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Cuitlahuac Tahua Rivera, Petitioner
v.
California
Docketed:
September 13, 2019
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of California
Case Numbers:
(S153881)
Decision Date:
May 23, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
June 26, 2019
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Sep 10 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 15, 2019)
Petition
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Proof of Service
Oct 15 2019
Brief of respondent State of California in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Oct 31 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 18 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen Michael Lathrop
Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Lathrop & Villa
904 Silver Spur Rd.
#403
Rolling Hills Estates, CA 90274
lathrop126813@gmail.com
310-237-1000
Party name: Cuitlahuac Rivera
Attorneys for Respondent
Darren Kyle Indermill
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of California
1300 I St.
Sacramento, CA 95814
Darren.Indermill@doj.ca.gov
916-210-7689
Party name: State of California
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##